TN HB0196 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TEMA to provide a report on a state of emergency to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives within six months of the end of the declaration of a state of emergency. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 58 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 58 and Title 68, relative to emergencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0120 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee