TN HB0196 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces, from no less than four to no more than four, the number of high school students who may serve on a local board of education as advisory, nonvoting members; deletes the requirement that half of the high school students selected to serve on the board must be enrolled in the college preparatory track and half must be enrolled in the technology track. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, reduces, from no less than four to no more than four, the number of high school students who may serve on a local board of education as advisory, nonvoting members; deletes the requirement that half of the high school students selected to serve on the board must be enrolled in the college preparatory track and half must be enrolled in the technology track. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192 | |
2019-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0180 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 192