TN HB0194 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the delivery of unsolicited newspapers and tabloids be suspended or terminated upon request of the owner or occupant of the property upon which such newspapers or tabloids are left. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
As introduced, requires the delivery of unsolicited newspapers and tabloids be suspended or terminated upon request of the owner or occupant of the property upon which such newspapers or tabloids are left. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-01 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0050 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0194&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0194.pdf |