TN HB0194 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the commission on technology to coordinate the development of broadband policies in an effort to advance the expansion of broadband across the state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the commission on technology to coordinate the development of broadband policies in an effort to advance the expansion of broadband across the state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-07HouseReset on Final cal. of Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2017-03-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-03HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2017-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0528 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-09 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback