TN HB0193 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, mandates, beginning with the 2021-2022 school year, that each LEA receive no less than a 50 percent state share in the instructional salaries and wages components, instructional benefits components, and classroom components. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 3, relative to the basic education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0180 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee