TN HB0187 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a local governmental entity is immune from liability for any cause of action or claim for damages arising out of a person's participation in a private appropriately licensed substance abuse treatment program approved by the court as an alternative facility. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4, relative to alternative facilities for DUI offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 386 | |
2021-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1590 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021