TN HB0187 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Failed for lack of motion in: Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Failed for lack of motion in: Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes TDOT to impose tolls on low-emission and energy-efficient vehicles and single occupancy vehicles that use managed/toll lanes on interstates; dedicates use of toll revenue to maintenance of managed/toll lanes; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, authorizes TDOT to impose tolls on low-emission and energy-efficient vehicles and single occupancy vehicles that use managed/toll lanes on interstates; dedicates use of toll revenue to maintenance of managed/toll lanes; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0299 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Failed in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee