TN HB0186 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner to make available to healthcare providers on the department's website the prescribed claims forms for reporting by healthcare providers. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2024-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024
2024-03-20HouseDef. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2024-03-20HousePlaced behind the budget
2024-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024
2023-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023
2023-04-05HousePlaced behind the budget
2023-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023
2023-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2023-03-13HouseRef. to Insurance Committee
2023-01-21HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0694 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback