TN HB0184 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the licensing of and prescribing authority for advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0176 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/1/2022

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback