TN HB0184 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-7)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act," which requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act," which requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0195 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback