TN HB0183 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, relative to art therapy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160
2021-04-05HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-15HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021
2021-03-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2021
2021-02-16HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2021
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0101 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 160

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback