TN HB0181 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Apr 14 @ 11:00 am in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2021." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to the annual coverage assessment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0123 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback