TN HB0178 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, includes as information open for public inspection the workers' compensation policy cancellation date and the policy reinstatement date. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, includes as information open for public inspection the workers' compensation policy cancellation date and the policy reinstatement date. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345 | |
2015-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0174 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 345
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0178&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0178.pdf |