TN HB0169 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes up to two members of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections if the city's charter provides nonresident property owners voting rights. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, relative to voting rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15HouseFailed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-01HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/1/2023
2023-02-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/1/2023
2023-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/22/2023
2023-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2023-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0176 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback