TN HB0167 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a mandatory 30-day sentence for theft of a firearm; creates the Class D felony offense of bringing a telecommunication device into a penal institution; revises other various provisions of criminal law. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a mandatory 30-day sentence for theft of a firearm; creates the Class D felony offense of bringing a telecommunication device into a penal institution; revises other various provisions of criminal law. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseAction def. in Judiciary to 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0403 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback