TN HB0162 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires TSAC to provide one-time grants, subject to appropriation, to students enrolled in eligible postsecondary institutions who have lost a family member due to COVID-19 to assist the students in completing their degree or credential. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-16HouseAction Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0335 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback