TN HB0158 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from January 15 to January 20, the date by which the commission on aging and disability must provide to the general assembly an annual report and analysis on the waiting list for the state options program. - Amends TCA Section 71-2-105.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 71-2-105, relative to the commission on aging and disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1242 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2022