TN HB0156 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a two-year pilot program for a litter control corridor on two state highways in Davidson County; requires 5 percent of litter control grant funding that Davidson County receives from bottled beverage taxes to be set aside to pay for the pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Section 41-2-123; Title 54; Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Section 41-2-123; Title 54; Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 4, relative to litter.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0130 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-15 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback