TN HB0156 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises offense regarding destruction or interference with utility lines, fixtures or appliances, or property utilized by railroads to apply to certain activities involving critical infrastructure. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-411.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises offense regarding destruction or interference with utility lines, fixtures or appliances, or property utilized by railroads to apply to certain activities involving critical infrastructure. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-411.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 370
2019-04-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-20HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0264 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 370

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback