TN HB0152 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 30 to 60 days the period of advance notice a group policy for accident or sickness insurance must provide to a covered spouse prior to termination of the spouse's coverage as a result of divorce, legal separation, or other separation. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, increases from 30 to 60 days the period of advance notice a group policy for accident or sickness insurance must provide to a covered spouse prior to termination of the spouse's coverage as a result of divorce, legal separation, or other separation. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0171 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee