TN HB0150 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens offense of property owner allowing an "underage adult" to consume alcohol to apply to all minors; sets a mandatory fine for convictions offenses related to providing alcohol to minors. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4; Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4; Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 57, relative to underage consumption of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 430 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0157 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021