TN HB0146 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that a property and casualty insurer that has a specified medical expense benefit payable without regard to fault, and that does not permit assignment of the benefit, establish a process to disburse funds in the names of the insured and the healthcare provider as joint payees. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, removes the requirement that a property and casualty insurer that has a specified medical expense benefit payable without regard to fault, and that does not permit assignment of the benefit, establish a process to disburse funds in the names of the insured and the healthcare provider as joint payees. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 62 | |
2019-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee to 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0341 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 62