TN HB0139 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department, working jointly with the higher education commission, the board of regents, and public institutions of higher education, to establish a foster care youth outreach pilot program at a minimum of five public institutions of higher education. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 49, relative to educational supports for foster care youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HouseAction def. in Education Administration to 4/7/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-02HouseAction Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2021-01-14HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-01-13HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0722 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback