TN HB0138 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes parameters for biennial September sessions. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 3, relative to the general assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1053 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee