TN HB0138 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires peace officers to issue citations in lieu of continued custody and taking an arrested person before a magistrate after the commission of certain offenses; authorizes law enforcement agencies to create programs to refer individuals to treatment for substance abuse in lieu of arrest under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires peace officers to issue citations in lieu of continued custody and taking an arrested person before a magistrate after the commission of certain offenses; authorizes law enforcement agencies to create programs to refer individuals to treatment for substance abuse in lieu of arrest under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0138&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0138.pdf |