TN HB0137 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enables a person who has been disqualified from exercising the right to vote due to a felony conviction to apply for restoration of voting rights if making payments in accordance with a payment plan for court costs, restitution, or overdue child support. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enables a person who has been disqualified from exercising the right to vote due to a felony conviction to apply for restoration of voting rights if making payments in accordance with a payment plan for court costs, restitution, or overdue child support. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0036 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback