TN HB0137 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the department of health to establish a prescription drug donation repository program. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the department of health to establish a prescription drug donation repository program. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 392
2017-05-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-02HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2017
2017-04-26HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
2017-04-19HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAction def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/12/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-22HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2017-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-03HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2017-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0429 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 392

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback