TN HB0136 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner to include in the annual block grant report information detailing the department's access to the use of federal TANF funds. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1, relative to temporary assistance for needy families (TANF).
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 693 | |
2022-02-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/14/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/10/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/25/2022 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0132 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022