TN HB0136 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each local government with one or more audit findings in its annual audit to submit a corrective action plan to the comptroller that addresses the actions taken or to be taken in response to each audit finding received in the annual audit. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, requires each local government with one or more audit findings in its annual audit to submit a corrective action plan to the comptroller that addresses the actions taken or to be taken in response to each audit finding received in the annual audit. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 383 | |
2017-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0315 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 383