TN HB0130 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-19)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department to increase the hourly wage for direct care professionals employed at contracted agencies of the department for the home- and community-based waiver programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, or any successor programs, such that on July 1, 2021, the hourly wage is at least $12.50 per hour. - Amends TCA Title 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33, relative to the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities.

Sponsors

Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]
Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 576
2021-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced behind the budget
2021-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-01-14HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2021-01-13HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0114 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 576

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback