TN HB0130 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a Class D felony offense of promoting travel for prostitution; adds the purchase of another person for the purpose of providing a commercial sex act to the types of conduct that constitute the criminal offense of trafficking a person for a commercial sex act; revises other provisions related to sexual servitude and commercial sex acts. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, creates a Class D felony offense of promoting travel for prostitution; adds the purchase of another person for the purpose of providing a commercial sex act to the types of conduct that constitute the criminal offense of trafficking a person for a commercial sex act; revises other provisions related to sexual servitude and commercial sex acts. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465 |
2013-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-02-20 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/20/2013 |
2013-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/12/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1033 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-31 - Pub. Ch. 465