TN HB0130 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Professional Educators Collaborative Conferencing Act of 2011." - Amends TCA Section 5-23-107 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Professional Educators Collaborative Conferencing Act of 2011." - Amends TCA Section 5-23-107 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378 | |
2011-05-16 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Rec. For Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Re-referred To: Education Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0113 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 378