TN HB0130 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to summer study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to summer study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires landlords of residential property to furnish an energy audit on any premises for rent before entering into a lease on such premises. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires landlords of residential property to furnish an energy audit on any premises for rent before entering into a lease on such premises. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to summer study | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/03/2010 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 2nd calendar, 2010 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0250 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0130&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0130.pdf |