TN HB0127 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the offense of indecent exposure in a penal institution to include actions committed against staff members in addition to guards; defines staff member as any person employed by a penal institution or who performs ongoing services in a penal institution, including, but not limited to, clergy, educators, and medical professionals. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-511.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, expands the offense of indecent exposure in a penal institution to include actions committed against staff members in addition to guards; defines staff member as any person employed by a penal institution or who performs ongoing services in a penal institution, including, but not limited to, clergy, educators, and medical professionals. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-511.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0080 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback