TN HB0126 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commission to create a baccalaureate degree for veterans who retire with 20 years of service; requires each state institution of higher education that offers a baccalaureate degree program to award the degree created by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires the commission to create a baccalaureate degree for veterans who retire with 20 years of service; requires each state institution of higher education that offers a baccalaureate degree program to award the degree created by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c House Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Education--Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0347 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee