TN HB0124 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Local Education Capital Investment Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Local Education Capital Investment Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0198 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee