TN HB0123 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 579
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 579
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes various new special license plates and grants additional time for certain plates to meet the minimum order requirement; revises other special license plate provisions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, relative to special license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 579 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0138 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021