TN HB0123 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the same police powers that municipal fire investigators have to certain salaried county fire investigators. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1315 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
As enacted, extends the same police powers that municipal fire investigators have to certain salaried county fire investigators. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1315 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0267 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 352