TN HB0122 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a court ordering grandparent visitation to include at least two visits per month with the grandparent; provided, that the court may order less frequent visitation if agreed to by the grandparent. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a court ordering grandparent visitation to include at least two visits per month with the grandparent; provided, that the court may order less frequent visitation if agreed to by the grandparent. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseDef. to Summer Study in Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0054 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Deferred to Summer Study

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback