TN HB0119 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits constables to post and mail detainer summonses in addition to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs. - Amends TCA Section 29-18-115.
Title
As enacted, permits constables to post and mail detainer summonses in addition to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs. - Amends TCA Section 29-18-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 160 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Reset on State Government Subcommittee cal. for next meeting. |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/18/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0197 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160