TN HB0117 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the department must submit the early grades reading report to the education committee of the senate and the education committees of the house of representatives by January 15 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2023-01-20 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0134 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee