TN HB0113 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds members of a county legislative body to the list of officials authorized to retain gratuities received for solemnization of marriage. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Title
As enacted, adds members of a county legislative body to the list of officials authorized to retain gratuities received for solemnization of marriage. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 159 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-12 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 1 |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1 |
2015-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Local Government Subcommittee cal. for next meeting. |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/18/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0335 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 159