TN HB0113 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes provisions relative to state licensing of dog and cat dealers. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, deletes provisions relative to state licensing of dog and cat dealers. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-06-02 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 6/3/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-21 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in Agriculture Committee to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Agriculture Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0041 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0113&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0113.pdf |