TN HB0112 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, reenacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act," which was repealed on January 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23, relative to the Proton Therapy Access Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-20HouseWithdrawn.
2023-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0076 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-18 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback