TN HB0112 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the statutes of limitation for various sexual offenses that are Class A or B felonies when committed against children on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the statutes of limitation for various sexual offenses that are Class A or B felonies when committed against children on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0592 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback