TN HB0109 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, permits correctional officers and certain other people employed by the department of correction to carry a handgun the same as a law enforcement officer if they have completed their probationary period rather than when they are vested. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1350.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, permits correctional officers and certain other people employed by the department of correction to carry a handgun the same as a law enforcement officer if they have completed their probationary period rather than when they are vested. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1350.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09 Pub. Ch. 92
2019-04-09 Effective date(s) 03/28/2019
2019-03-28 Signed by Governor.
2019-03-20HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-03-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-14HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-14SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-07HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 2
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1374 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 92

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback