TN HB0109 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the amount of marijuana possessed or exchanged under the offenses of simple possession or casual exchange from less than one-half ounce to less than one ounce; prohibits the inference of purpose of selling or otherwise dispensing when the substance possessed or exchanged was less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the amount of marijuana possessed or exchanged under the offenses of simple possession or casual exchange from less than one-half ounce to less than one ounce; prohibits the inference of purpose of selling or otherwise dispensing when the substance possessed or exchanged was less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 44 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HouseRef. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-10HouseFailed to pass H., Ayes 44, Nays 45, PNV 5
2017-04-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-10HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0254)
2017-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0144)
2017-04-06HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
2017-04-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-22HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseAction def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017
2017-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2017
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-26HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1134 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback