TN HB0109 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, sets requirements for radiological services that are provided in ambulatory surgical treatment centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, sets requirements for radiological services that are provided in ambulatory surgical treatment centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 39
2015-03-16HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-03-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2015
2015-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015
2015-03-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-02-25HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/4/2015
2015-02-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2015-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/24/2015
2015-02-17HouseMeeting Cancelled. Reset on Health Subcommittee cal. for next meeting.
2015-02-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/17/2015
2015-01-17HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2015-01-17HouseRef. to Health Committee
2015-01-17HouseP2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
2015-01-16HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-01-15HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0367 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 39

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback