TN HB0109 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the state or any political subdivision from adopting or implementing any policy recommendation that intentionally or inadvertently infringes upon or restricts private property rights without due process of law.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the state or any political subdivision from adopting or implementing any policy recommendation that intentionally or inadvertently infringes upon or restricts private property rights without due process of law.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0109&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0109.pdf |