TN HB0109 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a person alleged to have violated a condition of probation can be issued a summons to appear in court on the violation as well as arrested. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that a person alleged to have violated a condition of probation can be issued a summons to appear in court on the violation as well as arrested. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-08 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
2009-04-01 Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/08/2009
2009-03-25 Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/8/2009
2009-03-18 Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/25/2009
2009-03-10 Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to Judiciary
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0800 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback